+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4457
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4644
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 5111
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D 4214
- Matter Pass Retained
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 348
- File Number 517
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor