+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-202
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
- In Concurrence
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 326
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3387
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 184
- File Number 222
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 291 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 148
- Absent: 3
April 9, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 89 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (5)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor