+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act 18-45
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 521
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 514
- Senate Calendar Number 318
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 28, 2018: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor