+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 121
- File Number 126
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Sponsor
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor