+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-76
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- In Concurrence
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 469
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3365
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 3349
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3669
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 129
- File Number 165
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 276 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
April 24, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 175 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 3365
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 1
April 24, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 176 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 3349
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 1
April 24, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 179 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor