+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 331
- File Number 553
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/29
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor