+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-69
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 567
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 649
- Senate Calendar Number 480
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 237
- Yeas: 140
- Absent: 10
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 256 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (6)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor