+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 397
- File Number 603
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor