+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 202
- File Number 273
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor