+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 45
- Senate Calendar Number 64
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/18 10:00 AM
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2018: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 7
March 14, 2018: VA Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor