+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 213
- File Number 272
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsor
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor