+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 454
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 3335
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3336
- Senate Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Education
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 104
- File Number 114
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 148 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 3335
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 26
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 149 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 3336
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 1
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 150 PASS
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor