+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 394
- File Number 602
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations