+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 103
- File Number 113
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor