+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-198
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 19, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 421
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3616
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 480
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 303
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Education
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
April 17, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 127 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor