+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- File Number 93
- Senate Calendar Number 99
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor