+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Sponsors (3)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor