+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act 16-165
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 463
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 96
- Senate Calendar Number 131
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 6
April 20, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 146
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1