+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 70
- File Number 65
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Sponsors (2)
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor