+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-61
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6739
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 437
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5980
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 242
- Senate Calendar Number 205
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 207 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 119
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 17
April 24, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 152 PASS AS AMENDED BY A
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (34)
Energy and Technology Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor