+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 3455
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3459
- Matter Pass Retained
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Reconsidered
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 82
- File Number 62
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (16)
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 153 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 3455
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 22
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 154 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 3459
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor