+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act 18-66
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 458
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 95
- Senate Calendar Number 79
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: GL Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor