+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act 18-16
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 457
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 156
- Senate Calendar Number 121
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: GL Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor