+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 4, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 513
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 98
- File Number 110
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Vote
May 2, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 264 PASS
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor