+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Act 22-8
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 423
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- File Number 156
- Senate Calendar Number 145
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/01
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Sponsor
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor