+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act 18-51
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 532
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5316
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 269
- Senate Calendar Number 178
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2018: APP Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 5
March 19, 2018: ED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor