+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-5
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 19, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 414
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 35
- Senate Calendar Number 60
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 158
- Yeas: 141
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 8
April 17, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 131 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor