+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Special Act 14-20
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 495
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4123
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 168
- Senate Calendar Number 132
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
May 1, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 260 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor