+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 73
- Senate Calendar Number 93
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 10:00 AM
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging