+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/20
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (9)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor