+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act 18-83
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5329
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 558
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 267
- Senate Calendar Number 175
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2018: PS Vote Tally Sheet-A
March 16, 2018: PS Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 1