+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5712
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 179
- Senate Calendar Number 175
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor