+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 89
- Senate Calendar Number 73
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Vote
March 9, 2018: PH Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor