+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 204
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 176
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/01
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate