+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 453
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 101
- File Number 109
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 166 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (2)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor