+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Housing
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 203
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 174
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing