+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-103
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 452
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 563
- Senate Calendar Number 391
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 291 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 148
- Absent: 3
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 164 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (6)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor