+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-27
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 451
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on General Law
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 167
- Senate Calendar Number 131
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 214
- Yeas: 123
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 9
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 155 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (14)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor