+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act 16-74
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 459
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4422
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 259
- Senate Calendar Number 195
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 233 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8
April 20, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 143 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2