+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 398
- File Number 606
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor