+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Housing
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 127
- Senate Calendar Number 140
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment