+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 658
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7810
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 65
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 11
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/19/15 5:00 PM
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/05
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
- Vote to Draft
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 309 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7810
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 21
May 28, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 310 PASS
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor