+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 440
- Senate Calendar Number 271
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/19
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor