+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 316
- Senate Calendar Number 219
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
+ − Sponsor
Banks Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor