+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Act 16-2
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 397
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 308
- Senate Calendar Number 248
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/01
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 62
- Yeas: 139
- Absent: 11
April 13, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 107
- Yeas: 36