+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 483
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 206
- File Number 313
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/11
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor