+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act 21-2
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor in Original
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Governor
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,G,H
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,G,H
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 11006
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 11000
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 10996
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 10921
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule G 11007
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 11011
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 10974
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule H 11013
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,G,H
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate Transmittal to the House
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10933
- Emergency Certification
+ − Amendments (16)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor