+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor