+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-87
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 617
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 716
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 534
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 04/01
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 290
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 13
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 282 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (10)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor