+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-102
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
- On Consent Calendar
- In Concurrence
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 321
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 165
- File Number 185
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
April 9, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 85 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (4)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor